Global Patent Index - EP 0942958 B1

EP 0942958 B1 2001-12-19 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERGENTE

Publication

EP 0942958 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97950085 A

Priority

  • EP 9706073 W
  • GB 9625066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824876A1] A process for the production of a detergent powder composition having a bulk density of no more than 750 g/l, e.g. no more than 700 or 650 g/1, the process comprising mixing a particulate starting material which contains no more than 10 % by weight of the starting material of detergent active material and which starting material has a d50 average particle diameter of from 100 mu m to 1000 mu m and a particle porosity of at least 0.4, together with a liquid component comprising a detergent active material or a precursor therefor in a mixer/granulator having both a stirring and a cutting action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0270240 B1 19930922

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824876 A1 19980611; AR 009644 A1 20000426; AU 5316898 A 19980629; AU 721831 B2 20000713; BR 9714494 A 20000321; CA 2273849 A1 19980611; CA 2273849 C 20070410; CN 1188505 C 20050209; CN 1245530 A 20000223; DE 69709398 D1 20020131; DE 69709398 T2 20020620; DE 69709398 T3 20070419; EA 001453 B1 20010423; EA 199900516 A1 20000228; EP 0942958 A1 19990922; EP 0942958 B1 20011219; EP 0942958 B2 20061213; ES 2169882 T3 20020716; GB 9625066 D0 19970122; ID 22478 A 19991021; TR 199901756 T2 19991122; ZA 9709825 B 19990430

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131029

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709398

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131029

2014-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071029

2007-07-13 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070324

2006-12-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20020910

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169882 T3

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709398 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000216

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT