Global Patent Index - EP 0943026 A4

EP 0943026 A4 2000-05-24 - A METHOD FOR INSECT-RESIST TREATMENT OF CARPETS, TEXTILES AND INSULATION PRODUCTS

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR INSECT-RESIST TREATMENT OF CARPETS, TEXTILES AND INSULATION PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEPPICHEN, TEXTILIEN UND ISOLIERENDEN PRODUKTEN GEGEN INSEKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT INSECTIFUGE POUR TAPIS, TEXTILES ET PRODUITS ISOLANTS

Publication

EP 0943026 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932044 A

Priority

  • NZ 9700094 W
  • NZ 29905196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9803718A1] A method of insect-resist treating carpets, textiles and insulation products and a product produced by the method in which a proportion of synthetic or regenerated natural fibre, which has been pre-treated with an effective insecticide, is blended with wool fibres. The effective insecticide can be any insect growth regulator which has an insect-resist effect such as permethrin. When using the pre-treated fibre to insect-resist wool the aim is to add as little as possible to the overall fibre blend so as to minimise the proportion of synthetic or regenerated natural fibres in the blend.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 53/08 (2006.01); D06M 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 16/006 (2013.01); D06M 16/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9803718 A1 19980129; AU 3560297 A 19980210; AU 732690 B2 20010426; EP 0943026 A1 19990922; EP 0943026 A4 20000524; EP 0943026 B1 20031217

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070724

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070724

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CANESIS NETWORK LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-09-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CANESIS NETWORK LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *CANESIS NETWORK LTDCORNER OF SPRINGS ROAD AND GER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *CANESIS NETWORK LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE GB

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010625

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 06M 16/00 A, 7D 06M 13/236 B, 7D 06M 13/00 B

2000-05-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE GB

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990129

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE GB