Global Patent Index - EP 0943032 B1

EP 0943032 B1 2000-09-13 - MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM FOR MODIFYING, DECOMPOSING OR BLEACHING LIGNIN OR LIGNIN-CONTAINING MATERIALS, AND PROCESS FOR USING THE SAME

Title (en)

MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM FOR MODIFYING, DECOMPOSING OR BLEACHING LIGNIN OR LIGNIN-CONTAINING MATERIALS, AND PROCESS FOR USING THE SAME

Title (de)

MEHRKOMPONENTENSYSTEM ZUM VERÄNDERN, ABBAU ODER BLEICHEN VON LIGNIN ODER LIGNINHALTIGEN MATERIALIEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER ANWENDUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME A COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES POUR MODIFIER, DECOMPOSER OU BLANCHIR LA LIGNINE OU DES MATERIAUX QUI CONTIENNENT DE LA LIGNINE, ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0943032 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952038 A

Priority

  • DE 19651099 A
  • EP 9706802 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19651099A1] A multicomponent system for modifying, decomposing or bleaching lignin, lignin-containing materials or similar substances contains (a) if required at least one oxidation catalyst, (b) at least one appropriate oxidising agent, and (c) at least one mediator characterised in that it is selected from the group composed of hydroxypyridine, aminopyridine, hydroxyquinoline, aminoquinoline, hydroxyisoquinoline, aminoisoquinoline, with nitroso or mercapto substituents at the ortho or para position with respect to the hydroxy or amino groups. Also disclosed are tautomers of said compounds, as well as their salts, ethers and esters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10; D21C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/00 (2006.01); C08H 8/00 (2010.01); D21C 5/00 (2006.01); D21C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 5/005 (2013.01); D21C 9/1036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651099 A1 19980610; AT 196331 T 20000915; AU 5560398 A 19980703; AU 719140 B2 20000504; BR 9714387 A 20000516; CA 2271937 A1 19980618; CN 1240008 A 19991229; EP 0943032 A1 19990922; EP 0943032 B1 20000913; ES 2150797 T3 20001201; JP 2000505844 A 20000516; PT 943032 E 20001229; RU 2154704 C1 20000820; WO 9826127 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59702358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-07-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2001-12-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010112

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150797

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001129

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-11-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-11-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001121

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-11-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001120

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-19

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI PT SE

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196331

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991018

1999-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM FOR MODIFYING, DECOMPOSING OR BLEACHING LIGNIN OR LIGNIN-CONTAINING MATERIALS, AND PROCESS FOR USING THE SAME

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM FOR MODIFYING, DECOMPOSING OR BLEACHING LIGNIN OR LIGNIN-CONTAINING MATERIALS, AND PROCESS FOR USING THE SAME

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990527

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI PT SE