Global Patent Index - EP 0943054 B1

EP 0943054 B1 2002-09-18 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0943054 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936173 A

Priority

  • DE 9801628 W
  • DE 19744518 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19744518A1] With the conical valve sealing surface (15), the arrangement works in conjunction with a valve sealing surface (19) on the valve body (1) for control of an injection cross-section. The valve member (11), via an inner guide, can slidingly move on a pin (9) of a static insert body (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19744518 A1 19990415; EP 0943054 A1 19990922; EP 0943054 B1 20020918; JP 2001506345 A 20010515; US 6247452 B1 20010619; WO 9919619 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805604

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110616

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110815

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805604 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991022

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB