Global Patent Index - EP 0943063 B1

EP 0943063 B1 2001-12-19 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN AIR CUSHION ON A RECEIVING STRUCTURE AND AIR CUSHION OBTAINED USING THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN AIR CUSHION ON A RECEIVING STRUCTURE AND AIR CUSHION OBTAINED USING THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LUFTKISSENS AUF EINE AUFNAHMESTRUKTUR UND MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES LUFTKISSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN COUSSIN D'AIR SUR UNE STRUCTURE DE RECEPTION ET COUSSIN D'AIR OBTENU PAR LE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0943063 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97951316 A

Priority

  • FR 9702279 W
  • FR 9615466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2757236A1] The method consists in: making the top (1) of the cushion by moulding an airtight material, said moulded top (1) being made up of a flexible shell shaped according to the desired volume, said shell being bordered by a peripheral seat (4); independently preparing the receiving structure (2) with a continuous groove (5) the general shape of which corresponds to the outline of the peripheral seat (4) of the top (1); and tightly fixing the peripheral seat (4) of the top (1) into the continuous groove provided in the receiving structure (2). The invention can have a variety of applications. It can be used for forming the damping element to enhance the comfort and/or safety of saddles, cars or footwear for example.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16F 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16F 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2757236 A1 19980619; FR 2757236 B1 20010119; AT 211224 T 20020115; AU 5488998 A 19980703; DE 69709399 D1 20020131; DE 69709399 T2 20020814; EP 0943063 A1 19990922; EP 0943063 B1 20011219; ES 2170426 T3 20020801; PT 943063 E 20020628; WO 9826196 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051211

2005-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031212

2004-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031212

2003-07-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRIZOT GERARD

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-02 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030402

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170426 T3

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709399 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2001-12-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211224 T 20020115

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT