Global Patent Index - EP 0943224 B1

EP 0943224 B1 2003-06-25 - ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER COMPRISING SPRING CONTACTS FORMED WITH AT LEAST ONE BEND

Title (en)

ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER COMPRISING SPRING CONTACTS FORMED WITH AT LEAST ONE BEND

Title (de)

ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER MIT FEDERKONTAKTEN MIT MINDESTENS EINER BIEGUNG

Title (fr)

TRANSDUCTEUR ELECTROACOUSTIQUE COMPORTANT DES CONTACTS A RESSORT QUI PRESENTENT AU MOINS UNE COURBURE

Publication

EP 0943224 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98900975 A

Priority

  • EP 98900975 A
  • EP 97890035 A
  • IB 9800147 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/06 (2006.01); H04R 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

AT 243909 T 20030715; DE 69815808 T2 20040519; EP 0943224 A1 19990922; EP 0943224 B1 20030625; JP 2000509934 A 20000802; JP 4011630 B2 20071121

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120205

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815808

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120205

2012-08-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KNOWLES ELECTRONICS ASIA PTE. LTD., SINGAPORE, SG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 69815808

- Effective date: 20120709

2012-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69815808

- Representative's name: BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120709

2012-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69815808

- Representative's name: BOSCH JEHLE PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2011-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KNOWLE ELECTRONICS ASIA PTE. LTD, SG

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110209

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-14 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815808 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990303

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB