Global Patent Index - EP 0943270 A3

EP 0943270 A3 2000-12-06 - Sliding element for sheets and blankets

Title (en)

Sliding element for sheets and blankets

Title (de)

Gleitelement für Bettücher und Decken

Title (fr)

Dispositif coulissant pour draps et couvertures

Publication

EP 0943270 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99470008 A

Priority

FR 9803501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943270A2] The device for the tidying bedding comprises a sliding system with two lateral rails (1) fixed on side of the bed. Rollers (2) which slide inside the rails are fastened by clamps (3) to the sheets and covers. A groove (5) in the upper part of the rail allows the clamp springs to pass through.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 21/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943270 A2 19990922; EP 0943270 A3 20001206; FR 2776171 A1 19990924

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-09-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI