Global patent index - EP 0943272 A3

EP 0943272 A3 2000-09-20 - Refrigerated shelf and display module therefor

Title (en)

Refrigerated shelf and display module therefor

Title (de)

Kühlregal und Präsentationsmodul hierfür

Title (fr)

Etagère réfrigérée et module d'affichage pour cette étagère

Publication

EP 0943272 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104995 A

Priority

DE 29804825 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943272A2] A shelf structure to hold and display chilled merchandise, especially in supermarkets and food stores, has modular boxes (7) at an upper edge and especially an upper closure wall (6) of the shelf section (2). The sides of the module boxes (7), towards the front of the chilled shelf (1), have at least one transparent display advertisement (13) in a pref. transparent holder (12), illuminated by the lighting over the modular boxes (7). The carrier (12) is two "Plexiglas" (RTM; acrylic glass) plates, with the printed display advertisement (13) between them, as a continuous strip moved by an electromotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/00; A47F 3/04; B29C 49/00; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/04 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2013.01); A47F 3/001 (2013.01); A47F 3/0452 (2013.01); A47F 3/0482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804825 U1 19980604; EP 0943272 A2 19990922; EP 0943272 A3 20000920

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-06-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47F 3/00 A, 7A 47F 3/04 B, 7G 09F 15/00 B, 7B 29C 49/00 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI