Global Patent Index - EP 0943280 A3

EP 0943280 A3 2001-05-23 - Universal towel holder device for radiators

Title (en)

Universal towel holder device for radiators

Title (de)

Universal Handtuchhaltevorrichtung für Radiatoren

Title (fr)

Dispositif universel de support de serviette pour radiateurs

Publication

EP 0943280 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200826 A

Priority

IT RE980014 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943280A2] The device comprises a horizontal telescopic bar (2), to the ends of which there are fixed two opposing, mutually specular profiled brackets (3, 4) arranged to grip two radiating elements (5) of the radiator which are perpendicular to said telescopic bar (2), and, positioned in the interior of the telescopic bar (2), a means (6) having its ends fixed to the two bar components (20, 21) and arranged to pull/push the brackets (3, 4) against said two elements (5) of the radiator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/06; D06F 57/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/06 (2006.01); D06F 57/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/127 (2013.01); A47K 10/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943280 A2 19990922; EP 0943280 A3 20010523; IT 245224 Y1 20020320; IT RE980014 U1 19990920

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 10/06 A, 7D 06F 57/12 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI