Global Patent Index - EP 0943282 A3

EP 0943282 A3 2000-04-12 - Dishwasher

Title (en)

Dishwasher

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Lave-vaiselle

Publication

EP 0943282 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101369 A

Priority

DE 19812231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943282A2] The rpm of the pump motor is adjustable, so that the pressure of the rinsing liquid is controllable. The strength of the spray jets (15,16,21) from a top and bottom spray arm (14,20) and so the cleaning effect for crockery parts located in the dishwasher depend on the pressure of the rinsing liquid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; A47L 15/23; A47L 15/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/23 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4289 (2013.01); A47L 15/4221 (2013.01); A47L 15/4225 (2013.01); A47L 15/23 (2013.01); A47L 2301/04 (2013.01); A47L 2501/03 (2013.01); A47L 2501/04 (2013.01); A47L 2501/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943282 A2 19990922; EP 0943282 A3 20000412; EP 0943282 B1 20041229; DE 19812231 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-03-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KGSCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-11-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. KGSCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAEGE

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911348 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISHWASHER

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI