Global Patent Index - EP 0943309 A3

EP 0943309 A3 2000-03-01 - Baby pacifier

Title (en)

Baby pacifier

Title (de)

Babyschnuller

Title (fr)

Sucette pour bébé

Publication

EP 0943309 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105426 A

Priority

DE 19811938 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943309A2] The sound component (5) responds to a volume alteration of the dummy component (2) and to an air impulsion or out of the inner space of the elastic dummy component, producing a squeak, whistle or similar. The sound component is such that by movement of the dummy by mechanical contact a sound is produced. The sounds component is formed by at least one, e.g. closed hollow body, in which at least one sound-producing mass works in conjunction with a surface of the hollow body. The dummy can contain an electronic sound module, with an electrical-acoustic converter for producing the sound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 17/002 (2015.05); A61J 17/001 (2015.05); A61J 2200/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943309 A2 19990922; EP 0943309 A3 20000301; DE 19811938 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI