Global Patent Index - EP 0943348 A3

EP 0943348 A3 2000-06-07 - Fluid-flow control apparatus for a medical fluid container

Title (en)

Fluid-flow control apparatus for a medical fluid container

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ausflusskontrolle für einen Behälter für medizinische Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle d'écoulement de fluide pour un récipient pour fluides médicaux

Publication

EP 0943348 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99250073 A

Priority

US 3970598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943348A2] A fluid-flow control apparatus, e.g., for a medical fluid container, includes a primary closure and a secondary closure. The primary closure may include a rupturable membrane while the secondary closure may include a re-positionable cover or lid which protects the primary closure during shipping and storage and which enables or disables fluid flow. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/14; A61J 1/05; A61M 39/20; A61M 39/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943348 A2 19990922; EP 0943348 A3 20000607; CA 2265200 A1 19990916; ZA 9902077 B 19990927

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 5/14 A, 7A 61M 39/22 B, 7A 61M 39/20 B, 7A 61J 1/05 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI