Global Patent Index - EP 0943373 B1

EP 0943373 B1 2002-09-04 - Process for repairing small defects in powder coatings

Title (en)

Process for repairing small defects in powder coatings

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reparatur kleiner Lackfehler bei Pulverlackschichten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour réparer de petits défauts dans des revêtements à base de peinture en poudre

Publication

EP 0943373 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104226 A

Priority

DE 19812235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943373A1] A method for repairing faults in powder paint coatings cuts out the fault area with a precision cut and replaces the removed paint with a precision cut insert (3). The insert is charged with a potential opposite to that of the coating prior to insertion to ensure a snug fit. The cut is pre-cleaned with an ionised gas stream . The insert can be cut from a foil. The repaired coating is heat treated while compressed by a pressure pad (4) with a release coating (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943373 A1 19990922; EP 0943373 B1 20020904; DE 19812235 A1 19990930; DE 19812235 C2 20020620; ES 2182416 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030304

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182416 T3

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902513 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05D 5/00 A

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR REPAIRING SMALL DEFECTS IN POWDER COATINGS

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICRO COMPACT CAR SMART GMBH

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KARL WOERWAG LACK- UND FARBENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EISENMANN MASCHINENBAU KG

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990811

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI