Global Patent Index - EP 0943374 A3

EP 0943374 A3 2000-05-24 - Wobbling screen

Title (en)

Wobbling screen

Title (de)

Taumelsiebmaschine

Title (fr)

Tamis à vacillement

Publication

EP 0943374 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105611 A

Priority

DE 19811746 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943374A2] A mounting for a floor standing motorised sieve has a housing (6) which sits on the floor and inside which is fitted the vertical support shaft for the sieve. The support shaft is has an eccentric coupling to the sieve and is driven by an electric motor. The housing includes a flexible skirt between the bottom part of the housing and the base beneath the sieve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943374 A2 19990922; EP 0943374 A3 20000524; DE 19811746 A1 19990923; DE 19811746 C2 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-03-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI