Global patent index - EP 0943378 A3

EP 0943378 A3 2001-04-25 - Device for the feeding and lateral displacement of rolled wire loops

Title (en)

Device for the feeding and lateral displacement of rolled wire loops

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Führung und Querverschiebung von Walzdrahtwindungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'alimentation et le déplacement latéral de boucles de fil laminé

Publication

EP 0943378 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104713 A

Priority

DE 19811649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943378A2] A method for stacking coiled wire from a wire rolling process has the hot coils (S) laid flat onto a horizontal conveyer (2) in a continuos process. The cooled coils are dropped over a former (5) to stack and with the coils guided by pendant arms (3) which are swung into the stacking housing through slots in the sides of the housing. The pendant arms are driven by servo drives linked to a common control, or by control rings which impart an even force on the arms. The arms are made of hardened metal, or are coated with hardened metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 41/00 (2006.01); B21C 47/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4357965 A 19821109 - KOSUGE YASUO, et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 151 (M - 1576) 14 March 1994 (1994-03-14)
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 03 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943378 A2 19990922; EP 0943378 A3 20010425; DE 19811649 A1 19990923; JP H11319930 A 19991124; US 6158683 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE GB IT SE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI