Global Patent Index - EP 0943401 B1

EP 0943401 B1 2001-12-05 - Pneumatic screwdriver

Title (en)

Pneumatic screwdriver

Title (de)

Pneumatischer Schrauber

Title (fr)

Visseuse pneumatique

Publication

EP 0943401 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98401730 A

Priority

FR 9803370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943401A1] The pneumatic tool holder consists of, at one end, a connection for the air supply, and at the other end, a tool gripper. A pneumatic motor (2) is located within the holder with the valve to control the supply of air. A torque limiter is fitted between the motor and the tool and consists of a primary drive dog (48), fitted to the motor shaft, and a secondary drive dog (50), linked to the kinematic drive to the tool. Axial movement of the primary dog causes a reduction in air pressure to reduce the drive. The torque limiter consists of two drive dogs, with three drive teeth (53) are fitted on the face of the primary dog each with a hollow (54) towards the rear of the tooth. A drive ball (52) is fitted into each of the hollows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/145 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943401 A1 19990922; EP 0943401 B1 20011205; DE 69802778 D1 20020117; DE 69802778 T2 20020523; ES 2166131 T3 20020401; FR 2776220 A1 19990924; FR 2776220 B1 20000505; US 6085849 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040709

2005-07-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050708

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040708

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040708

2003-07-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030714

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030701

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166131 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802778 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI