Global Patent Index - EP 0943405 A3

EP 0943405 A3 2001-05-16 - Ultrasonic cutting device

Title (en)

Ultrasonic cutting device

Title (de)

Ultraschallschneidevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe à ultra-sons

Publication

EP 0943405 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200542 A

Priority

GB 9805569 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943405A2] An ultrasonic cutting system comprising an ultrasonic vibrating device (10) having an operative face, a block horn (11) having a responsive face connected to the operative face of the ultrasonic vibrating device (10) and an operative face, and a plurality of cutting blades (13) mounted on the operative face of the block horn (11) so as to be vibrated thereby/therewith, the blades lying in a plane containing the longitudinal axis of vibrations characterised in that the block horn (11) is provided with at least one tuning slot (12) traversing the block between the operative and responsive faces. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 367 (M - 1008) 9 August 1990 (1990-08-09)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943405 A2 19990922; EP 0943405 A3 20010516; AU 2035799 A 19990930; BR 9901008 A 20000222; GB 9805569 D0 19980513; ZA 9902071 B 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020914

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI