Global Patent Index - EP 0943443 A3

EP 0943443 A3 2000-04-05 - Method and apparatus for printing on thermosensitive paper

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for printing on thermosensitive paper

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken von Thermochromic-Schichten

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil d'impression sur papier thermosensitif

Publication

EP 0943443 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104836 A

Priority

DE 19811539 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943443A2] The thermochromic layer is heated for erasure. Appropriate set values of time and temperature are used, rendering the layer colorless. Localized further heating, using a different set interval and temperature, bring about color change, which is followed by rapid cooling below erasure temperature, to leave the printed points intact. The process is repeated until all rows of points have been printed. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding thermal printing equipment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/365; B41J 2/315; B41J 2/355

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/365 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943443 A2 19990922; EP 0943443 A3 20000405; EP 0943443 B1 20050302; DE 19811539 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911671

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-06-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ATLANTIC ZEISER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOEWE CARDTEC GMBH, 33106 PADERBORN, DE

- Document: DE 59911671

- Effective date: 20110412

2006-11-03 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911671 P 20050407

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOEWE CARDTEC GMBH

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040421

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 2/365 A, 7B 41J 2/355 B, 7B 41J 2/315 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI