Global Patent Index - EP 0943461 B1

EP 0943461 B1 2003-06-04 - An inserter for inserting documents into envelopes

Title (en)

An inserter for inserting documents into envelopes

Title (de)

Kuvertiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine pour mettre des documents sous enveloppe

Publication

EP 0943461 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99104092 A

Priority

GB 9805903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943461A1] Disclosed herein is a document inserter including an insertion station (120), feed means (240) for feeding an envelope to the insertion station along an envelope feed path (244), a stop (16) arranged in the envelope feed path for arresting the fed envelope in a predetermined position at the insertion station. The stop is adjustable in position for adapting the insertion station to envelopes of varying size (height). For this purpose, input means (133), such as a keyboard, are provided for enabling an operator to input data defining a stop position. In addition, control means (132) are operative to adjust the stop position in accordance with the input data. Preferably, the stop (16) is carried by a support assembly (118) and can be pivoted upwardly to provide access to the insertion station. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943461 A1 19990922; EP 0943461 B1 20030604; DE 69908456 D1 20030710; GB 9805903 D0 19980513

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2003-09-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908456 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI