Global Patent Index - EP 0943538 A3

EP 0943538 A3 2001-02-07 - Life raft

Title (en)

Life raft

Title (de)

Rettungsinsel

Title (fr)

Radeau de sauvetage

Publication

EP 0943538 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302048 A

Priority

GB 9805542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943538A2] The present invention provides a life raft (10) comprising a base (11) attached to at least one inflatable buoyant tubular member (12a,12b,12c,12d) the buoyant tubular member forming the sides and/or ends of the raft (10) characterised in that the life raft (10) is substantially trapezoid in shape with one end being greater in volume and buoyancy than the other end. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/04 (2013.01); B63C 2009/042 (2013.01); B63C 2009/044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943538 A2 19990922; EP 0943538 A3 20010207; GB 2335393 A 19990922; GB 9805542 D0 19980513

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-11-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LIFE RAFT

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI