Global Patent Index - EP 0943542 A3

EP 0943542 A3 2000-05-17 - Clamping element for restraining freight within a cargo loading system, in particular in aircraft

Title (en)

Clamping element for restraining freight within a cargo loading system, in particular in aircraft

Title (de)

Riegelelement zum Arretieren von Frachtgütern innerhalb eines Frachtladesystems, insbesondere in einem Flugzeug

Title (fr)

Elément de verrouillage pour un système de blocage des colis dans une soute à fret, notament pour avion

Publication

EP 0943542 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101991 A

Priority

DE 19812014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812014C1] The tie system to secure freight in a cargo hold, and especially in an aircraft, has a limit stop (9) formed by at least two rollers (12,13). The first limit surface (12A) of the first roller (12) holds the freight (4) in the vertical plane, and the limit surface (13A) of the other roller (13) holds the freight (4) on the horizontal plane. The limit stop (9) can be a one-piece unit, or of two separate rollers (12,13). The limit surface (12A) of one roller (12) is slightly cambered. Or the rollers can have a truncated cone shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64D 9/00; B60P 1/64; B64C 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64C 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B64C 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812014 C1 19990819; EP 0943542 A2 19990922; EP 0943542 A3 20000517; EP 0943542 B1 20030806; US 6139232 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111118

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906470

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS AIRBUS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 64D 9/00 A, 7B 60P 1/64 B, 7B 64C 1/20 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI