Global Patent Index - EP 0943545 B1

EP 0943545 B1 2003-06-04 - Cutting blade for an adhesive tape dispenser

Title (en)

Cutting blade for an adhesive tape dispenser

Title (de)

Dispensermesser für Klebebandspender

Title (fr)

Lame de coupe pour un distributeur de ruban adhésif

Publication

EP 0943545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104164 A

Priority

DE 19811514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943545A2] The cutting edge has convexly rounded cutting teeth in relation to the adhesive film location and concavely rounded areas between adjacent cutting teeth. Between tooth points and tooth bases are linear areas. The tooth spacing (23) amounts to 1.25mm, the tooth height (24) amounts to 0.4mm, the curvature radius in the area of the contour between two adjacent tooth points (21) is 0.4mm and the curvature radius in the area of the tooth points (22) is 0.13mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943545 A2 19990922; EP 0943545 A3 19991201; EP 0943545 B1 20030604; DE 19811514 A1 19990923; ES 2200422 T3 20040301

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905788

2017-03-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20170201

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TESA SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TESA SE, 20253 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59905788

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-04-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200422 T3

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905788 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUEHMANN, BERND DR.

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OTTEN, ULRICH

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WACHTMANN, KLAUS DR.

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2000-08-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 65H 35/00 A

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI