Global patent index - EP 0943571 A3

EP 0943571 A3 2000-01-12 - Yarn feeder with improved yarn path

Title (en)

Yarn feeder with improved yarn path

Title (de)

Fadenliefergerät mit verbessertem Fadenlauf

Title (fr)

Fournisseur de fil avec une voie de fil ameliorée

Publication

EP 0943571 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103639 A

Priority

DE 19811240 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943571A2] The thread delivery wheel (6) is rotatably located around a rotary axis (7) and is arranged in a thread running path so that a thread is wound around it. A motor (9) drives the thread running wheel and the thread running path in connection with the thread delivery wheel is fixed at an acute angle different from zero to a plane (41) on which the rotary axis (7) stands vertically. The thread feed devices (25,6,22,26) contain a guide device (22), which feeds the thread exclusively in a first cross direction and is formed as a pin, over which the thread runs freely movably in the pin longitudinal direction. The thread locates on the guide device at an obtuse angle greater than 130 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/00 (2006.01); B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01); D04B 15/50 (2006.01); D04B 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943571 A2 19990922; EP 0943571 A3 20000112; EP 0943571 B1 20040609; BR 9901004 A 20000308; CA 2265382 A1 19990914; CA 2265382 C 20041109; CN 1238297 A 19991215; CO 4810243 A1 19990630; DE 19811240 A1 19990930; DE 19811240 C2 20000531; ES 2218889 T3 20041116; ID 22179 A 19990916; IL 128885 A 20030529; IL 128885 D0 20000131; JP 3133298 B2 20010205; JP H11292393 A 19991026; KR 19990077813 A 19991025; RU 2162816 C2 20010210; TR 9900565 A2 19991021; TR 9900565 A3 19991021; TW 473452 B 20020121; US 6131842 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100226

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110408

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-05-04 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

2007-04-27 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060225

2006-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060225

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2218889

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59909667

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040715

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB GR

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI