Global patent index - EP 0943572 A3

EP 0943572 A3 2000-01-19 - Display system for a spinning machine

Title (en)

Display system for a spinning machine

Title (de)

Anzeigeeinrichtung für eine Spinnereimaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'affichage pour un métier à filer

Publication

EP 0943572 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104290 A

Priority

  • JP 7163398 A
  • JP 7163498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943572A2] To provide a display system for a spinning machine making it possible to check whether the thickness and length of a cut yarn defect accurately corresponds to a clearing limit. The present invention relates to a display system for a spinning machine having local control units 4 and a central control unit 20, comprising a yarn defect judging means 19 provided at the local control units 4 to judge the yarn defect to be cut based on the waveform data captured from a clearer head 8a and a predetermined first criterion, and creates the first data on the thickness and length of the cut yarn defect; and a display means 5 having a thickness axis and a longitudinal axis and provided at the central control 20 displays a clearing limit in addition to the first criterion, wherein the first data for a number of the yarn defects cut by the yarn defect judging means 19 is transmitted to the central control unit 20, and the first data is displayed together with the clearing limit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/06; D01H 13/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/26 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/26 (2013.01); D01H 13/32 (2013.01); B65H 2551/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943572 A2 19990922; EP 0943572 A3 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011002

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE LI

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI