Global Patent Index - EP 0943578 A3

EP 0943578 A3 2002-09-11 - Crane

Title (en)

Crane

Title (de)

Kran

Title (fr)

Grue

Publication

EP 0943578 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105550 A

Priority

JP 7051198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943578A2] A fleet angle of a rope is suppressed to be small while employing a side drum type in which a winch drum is installed sideway of a boom. A drum arranging plane A which is a plane perpendicular to a drum shaft 6a passing through an axial center point Wo of a winch drum shaft 6a is inclined with respect to a boom moving plane so that a rope contact of a main guide sheave 8 includes two points P1 and P2 formed on a boom moving plane B by the raising and lowering of a boom 2. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/62; B66C 23/42; B66D 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/88 (2006.01); B66C 23/62 (2006.01); B66D 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/62 (2013.01); B66D 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943578 A2 19990922; EP 0943578 A3 20020911; JP 3436118 B2 20030811; JP H11263591 A 19990928; KR 100301942 B1 20010922; KR 19990077947 A 19991025

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 66C 23/62 A, 7B 66D 1/36 B, 7B 66C 23/42 B

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI