Global Patent Index - EP 0943584 B1

EP 0943584 B1 2002-11-13 - Fueling system

Title (en)

Fueling system

Title (de)

Brennstoffzufuhrsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en carburant

Publication

EP 0943584 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200539 A

Priority

IL 12370898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943584A1] A fueling system (10) including a fuel supply subsystem (14) including at least one fueling nozzle (16), and a recipient identifier (22) associated with a fill location (18) of a recipient fuel store (20), characterized by a fueling communicator (24) associated with the at least one fueling nozzle (16) and communicating in a wireless manner with the recipient identifier (22), at least in order to obtain recipient identification information therefrom, and an authorization and monitoring assembly (26) operative to communicate in a wireless manner with the fueling communicator (24) for receiving at least recipient identification information therefrom. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/14; B67D 5/33; E05B 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/34 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/348 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943584 A1 19990922; EP 0943584 B1 20021113; DE 69903871 D1 20021219; DE 69903871 T2 20030828; IL 123708 A 20031031; IL 123708 D0 19981030

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090311

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903871 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI