Global Patent Index - EP 0943702 B1

EP 0943702 B1 2002-09-04 - Electrolytic production of an amalgam from a metal salt

Title (en)

Electrolytic production of an amalgam from a metal salt

Title (de)

Verfahren zur elektrolytischen Herstellung von Amalgam aus Metallsalz

Title (fr)

Production électrolytique d'un amalgame à partir d'un sel métallique

Publication

EP 0943702 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106017 A

Priority

  • DE 19812105 A
  • DE 19905672 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943702A1] An anion exchange membrane is used in the electrolytic production of a metal salt amalgam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 1/00; C25C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 1/00 (2006.01); C25C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 1/00 (2013.01); C25C 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943702 A1 19990922; EP 0943702 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DEGUSSA A.G.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902516 20021010

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-07-24 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2002-07-17 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020418

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA AG

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000225

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI