Global Patent Index - EP 0943732 A3

EP 0943732 A3 2000-04-05 - Railway track and rail

Title (en)

Railway track and rail

Title (de)

Gleisoberbau und Schiene

Title (fr)

Voie de chemin de fer et rail

Publication

EP 0943732 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890095 A

Priority

AT 49598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943732A2] The head parts (8) of both rails have a preferably prismatic area (9) close to the foot and an area (10) remote from the foot with a contact surface (11) for the wheels. The contact surfaces in normal section to the rail longitudinal direction have a first and/or second curved profile curve, particularly with three part circles. The stand surface (6) of the rail (1,2) viewed normally to the rail longitudinal direction and in relation to the rail track has an inclination particularly of 1:40.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 5/02; E01B 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 5/02 (2013.01); E01B 2204/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943732 A2 19990922; EP 0943732 A3 20000405; EP 0943732 B1 20011205; AT 409872 B 20021227; AT A49598 A 20020415; DE 59900483 D1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160317

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160317

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160317

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900483

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KEILITZ & PARTNER, PARTNERSCHAF, DE

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900483

2016-04-08 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20160307

2016-04-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: OBB INFRASTRUKTUR AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, AT

- Effective date: 20160307

2016-01-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR AG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BAU AG, WIEN, AT

- Document: DE 59900483

2016-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900483

- Representative's name: KEILITZ & SOELLNER, PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2016-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900483

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KEILITZ & PARTNER, PARTNERSCHAF, DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-12-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900483

- Representative's name: KEILITZ & SOELLNER, PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-12-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900483

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KEILITZ & PARTNER, PARTNERSCHAF, DE

2007-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BAU AG

- Free text: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BETRIEB AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#ELISABETHSTRASSE 9#1010 WIEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BAU AG#VIVENOTGASSE 10#1120 WIEN (AT)

2007-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BETRIEB AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: OESTERREICHISCHE BUNDESBAHNEN#ELISABETHSTRASSE 9#1010 WIEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BETRIEB AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#ELISABETHSTRASSE 9#1010 WIEN (AT)

2007-10-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-09-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BAU AG

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-08-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-05-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: OEBB-INFRASTRUKTUR BETRIEB AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20050830

2005-07-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900483 20020117

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI