Global patent index - EP 0943736 A3

EP 0943736 A3 2000-05-17 - Bearing

Title (en)

Bearing

Title (de)

Lager

Title (fr)

Appui

Publication

EP 0943736 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200622 A

Priority

NL 1008614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943736A2] A bearing for a bridge comprises a bottom saddle (8) and a top saddle (9), between which there is a friction member (3) which has a relatively low coefficient of friction compared to the saddles. The friction member comprises a central sheet section (5) and an edge section (6) which is situated on the periphery of the said sheet section. An intermediate saddle (10) is situated between the bottom saddle (8) and the top saddle (9), which intermediate saddle (10) interacts with the bottom saddle (8) by means of a bottom friction member (12) and interacts with the top saddle (9) by means of a top friction member (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/046 (2013.01); E01D 19/04 (2013.01); E01D 19/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943736 A2 19990922; EP 0943736 A3 20000517; NL 1008614 C1 19990920

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI