Global patent index - EP 0943739 A3

EP 0943739 A3 2000-01-05 - Excavator, in particular mini-excavator

Title (en)

Excavator, in particular mini-excavator

Title (de)

Bagger, insbesondere Minibagger

Title (fr)

Excavateur, en particulier petit excavateur

Publication

EP 0943739 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104263 A

Priority

DE 29804856 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943739A2] The excavator has a top frame located on the chassis (1). The top frame has a motor chamber (10) and a valve chamber (11) which extends across the width of the fuel- or hydraulic tank (20,21). A driver cabin (4) having a driver seat is built approximately above the tank. The motor and valve chambers as well as the fluid tank are at least partly located within a frame (6). A heating unit (15) is located beneath the drivers seat in the cabin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/00 (2006.01); E02F 3/38 (2006.01); E02F 9/08 (2006.01); E02F 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 9/0883 (2013.01); E02F 3/325 (2013.01); E02F 3/384 (2013.01); E02F 9/0875 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804856 U1 19980709; AT 223542 T 20020915; EP 0943739 A2 19990922; EP 0943739 A3 20000105; EP 0943739 B1 20020904; JP 3386403 B2 20030317; JP H11310934 A 19991109; US 6170180 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2006-03-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAEFF-TEREX GMBH & CO. KG

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59902517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20021010

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 223542

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020915

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2000-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI