Global Patent Index - EP 0943745 A3

EP 0943745 A3 2001-01-10 - Anchoring device for a tension bar in a reinforced concrete mass

Title (en)

Anchoring device for a tension bar in a reinforced concrete mass

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verankerung eines Spannstabes in einer bewehrten Betonmasse

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'ancrage d'une barre de mise en tension, dans une masse de béton armé

Publication

EP 0943745 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810233 A

Priority

CH 65398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943745A2] The bracket (10) has a two-part construction, at least one part (16) containing an opening (22,24) for a tension rod (12) to be passed through, and the other part (20) including a stop for fixing the rod in a preselected angle relative to the bracket plane. The width of the tension rod opening in at least one direction (X) is chosen to provide the maximum tension rod angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/12; E04B 1/41; E04G 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943745 A2 19990922; EP 0943745 A3 20010110; EP 0943745 B1 20050504; AT 294904 T 20050515; DE 59911998 D1 20050609

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-07-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050624

2005-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREITER + WIEDMER AG

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911998 P 20050609

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE GB LI

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 5/12 A, 7E 04G 21/12 B, 7E 04B 1/41 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI