Global Patent Index - EP 0943774 A3

EP 0943774 A3 2000-04-19 - Actuator with adjustable stroke

Title (en)

Actuator with adjustable stroke

Title (de)

Betätiger mit einstellbarem Hub

Title (fr)

Actionneur à course réglable

Publication

EP 0943774 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830725 A

Priority

IT BO980038 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943774A2] A linear actuator with a chain, with adjustable stroke, comprises a box-shaped casing (1) which houses a chain (2), wound inside the casing (1) and which can be driven by drive means (3); between the casing (1) and the chain (2) means are envisaged which are designed to control the locking of the chain (2) unwinding stroke, said means consisting of an insert (12) which may be removed from the chain (2) and may be attached to the latter to allow the predefinable adjustment of the value of the chain (2) unwinding stroke, and a sensor (15) which detects the passage of the insert (12) when the latter is attached to the chain (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/10; E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/06 (2013.01); E05F 15/619 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/656 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/724 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943774 A2 19990922; EP 0943774 A3 20000419; EP 0943774 B1 20040310; ES 2216264 T3 20041016; IT 244728 Y1 20020314; IT BO980038 U1 19990920

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061204

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216264 T3

2004-06-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DOMINT S.R.L.

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-07-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GSG INTERNATIONAL S.P.A.

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GR IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI