Global Patent Index - EP 0943777 B2

EP 0943777 B2 2009-02-18 - Pre-mounted and pre-adjusted sectional door, and its conditioning

Title (en)

Pre-mounted and pre-adjusted sectional door, and its conditioning

Title (de)

Vormontiertes und voreingestelltes Sektionaltor, und seine Konditionierung

Title (fr)

Porte sectionnelle pré-montée pré-réglée, et son conditionnement

Publication

EP 0943777 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 99400680 A

Priority

FR 9803486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943776A1] The panel (7) which is specially intended for an up-and-over garage door is installed on another similar panel by pivoting around an axis parallel to the longitudinal horizontal direction. The panel includes first (16) and second (17) facings, rigidly fixed together, which define its large external parallel surfaces (18,19). A longitudinal edge (14) has a continuously decreasing thickness from the external surfaces as far as its free longitudinal edge (21). The transverse section of the edge is pseudo triangular.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01); E05D 15/24 (2006.01); E05D 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/485 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • US 5239777 A 19930831 - HUSSELTON MAHLON E [US]
  • US 3311159 A 19670328 - STANSBERRY ROBERT F
  • "Stores et Fermetures", EXTRAIT DE LA PUBLICATION, no. 95, 1991
  • "Stores et Fermetures", EXTRAIT DE LA PUBLICATION, no. 99, May 1992 (1992-05-01)
  • "Stores et Fermetures", EXTRAIT DE LA PUBLICATION, no. 113, May 1994 (1994-05-01) - June 1994 (1994-06-01)
  • PROSPECT DE LA SOCIETÉ NOVOFERM, no. 591400, August 1995 (1995-08-01)
  • "Novoferm Siebau vous ouvre ses portes", PROSPECT DE LA SOCIETÉ NOVOFERM SIEBAU, 18 October 1996 (1996-10-18)
  • "Tarif Public", PROSPECT DE LA SOCIETÉ NOVOFERM SIEBAU, April 1992 (1992-04-01)
  • "Tarif Public", PROSPECT DE LA SOCIETÉ NOVOFERM FRANCE S.A., no. 30, April 1995 (1995-04-01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943777 A1 19990922; EP 0943777 B1 20011107; EP 0943777 B2 20090218; AT 208456 T 20011115; AU 2844099 A 19991018; AU 2844199 A 19991018; CA 2290432 A1 19990930; CA 2290449 A1 19990930; DE 69900423 D1 20011213; DE 69900423 T2 20020711; DE 69900423 T3 20090917; DE 943776 T1 20000302; DE 943777 T1 20000302; EP 0943776 A1 19990922; FR 2776334 A1 19990924; FR 2776334 B1 20000616; WO 9949168 A1 19990930; WO 9949169 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100319

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *NOVOFERM FRANCE

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090401

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020320

2009-02-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NOVOFERM FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-07-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-07-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-09-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WAYNE-DALTON CORPORATION

2002-08-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WAYNE-DALTON CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-03-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-03-19 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-02-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900423 20011213

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208456 T 20011115

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-02 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-02-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991102

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI