Global Patent Index - EP 0943809 A3

EP 0943809 A3 2000-07-19 - Centrifugal pump

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifuge

Publication

EP 0943809 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890088 A

Priority

AT 46398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943809A2] The centrifugal pump has a pump wheel (27) on a drive shaft (26) and a multi-part casing (22), partly made of plastic, containing an induction cavity (24) on the drive side of the pump wheel and a spiral compression cavity (25). The metal bearing carrier (23) and plastic part (30) of the casing bound the induction cavity, which is preferably removable from the bearing carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 29/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/628 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01); F05C 2225/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943809 A2 19990922; EP 0943809 A3 20000719; EP 0943809 B1 20020605; AT 218676 T 20020615; AT 408791 B 20020325; AT A46398 A 20010715; DE 59901585 D1 20020711; ES 2175924 T3 20021116; US 6158958 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040312

2005-03-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175924 T3

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901585 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT SE

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218676 T 20020615

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR IT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI