Global Patent Index - EP 0943867 B1

EP 0943867 B1 2002-12-18 - Ceramic lining for a combustor

Title (en)

Ceramic lining for a combustor

Title (de)

Keramische Auskleidung einer Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Revêtement céramique pour une chambre de combustion

Publication

EP 0943867 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810220 A

Priority

EP 98810220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0943867A1] The lining comprises individual, adjacently arranged segments in the form of hollow chambers (3) with an interior (4) facing the interior of the combustion chamber and an outer wall (5) locating directly on the metallic support wall (2). The hollow chambers have a length extension which corresponds to that of the combustion chamber (1). The hollow chambers are provided for conducting cooling air and are filled with insulating material. The outer wall (5) of each hollow chamber is fixed to the metallic support wall by high temperature-proof screws and plate springs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/00; F23M 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F23M 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0943867 A1 19990922; EP 0943867 B1 20021218; DE 59806717 D1 20030130

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806717

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59806717

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806717

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806717

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806717 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806717 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI