Global patent index - EP 0944330 A4

EP 0944330 A4 2000-05-31 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR FIELD DICING/DISINFECTING PRODUCE AND BULK BAGGING/COOLING FOR EXTENDED SHELF LIFE

Title (en)

PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR FIELD DICING/DISINFECTING PRODUCE AND BULK BAGGING/COOLING FOR EXTENDED SHELF LIFE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÖRTLICHEN SCHNEIDEN/DESINFIZIEREN VON NAHRUNGSMITTELN UND SCHÜTTVERPACKEN/KÜHLEN ZUR VERLÄNGERTER LAGERBESTÄNDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES AU DECOUPAGE ET A LA DESINFECTION DE PRODUITS AGRICOLES SUR LE LIEU DE RECOLTE ET AU CONDITIONNEMENT EN VRAC ET AU REFROIDISSEMENT DE CES PRODUITS AFIN DE PROLONGER LEUR DUREE DE CONSERVATION

Publication

EP 0944330 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97936372 A

Priority

  • US 9713631 W
  • US 2362096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806273A1] A method and apparatus for field harvesting, coring, trimming, disinfecting, dicing, bagging and cooling produce, such as iceberg lettuce, comprising applying an antimicrobial disinfectant and lubricant solution to the internal mechanism of a cutter mechanism (109) mounted on the aft end of a self-propelled harvester vehicle. The antimicrobial is preferably a hypochlorite solution providing from 60 to about 700 ppm, preferably 80-300 ppm, of free chlorine in quantities sufficient to provide approximately 50 ppm of free chlorine in the run off from the cut produce after processing. Mounted on the aft end of the harvester vehicle platform is a pair of lateral conveyors (107) which feed harvested produce to the cutter, either directly or indirectly via a pair of elevator conveyors (108), a cutter mechanism, a cut produce transfer elevator (112) which lifts the cut produce pieces to a packing station comprising a hopper with bag lined toes or bins placed thereunder. Optionally, a spray of antimicrobial solution can be applied either to the produce coming on the lateral conveyors to the cutter, and/or the cut produce on the delivery elevator. The application of controlled concentrations and amounts of antimicrobial solution to the cutter elements during cutting, typically on the order of 50-120 gph, and preferably from 60-90 gph, results in a reduction in Total Aerobic Plate Count by over 80 %, and typically over 95 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23B 7/148; A23B 7/157; A23N 12/02; A23N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23B 7/148 (2006.01); A23B 7/157 (2006.01); A23N 12/02 (2006.01); A23N 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23B 7/148 (2013.01); A23B 7/157 (2013.01); A23N 12/02 (2013.01); A23N 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9426134 A1 19941124 - AEM MACHINERY LTD [GB], et al
  • [X] EP 0284761 A2 19881005 - FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]
  • [X] EP 0411536 A2 19910206 - KURARAY CO [JP]
  • [A] US 4856715 A 19890815 - FORDYCE DONALD E [US]
  • [PX] US 5560190 A 19961001 - OTTAWAY JAMES N [US]
  • [PX] WO 9702758 A1 19970130 - WOLFE STEVEN K [US], et al
  • [XA] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8536, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D13, AN 85-220221, XP002114296
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 006 30 June 1997 (1997-06-30)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9222, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D14, AN 92-181603, XP002114297
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 271 (C - 1203) 24 May 1994 (1994-05-24)
  • See also references of WO 9806273A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806273 A1 19980219; AU 3905997 A 19980306; EP 0944330 A1 19990929; EP 0944330 A4 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 23B 7/148 A, 7A 23B 7/157 B, 7A 23N 12/02 B, 7A 23N 15/00 B

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB