Global Patent Index - EP 0944345 B1

EP 0944345 B1 2001-04-04 - SCOURING ELEMENT

Title (en)

SCOURING ELEMENT

Title (de)

SCHEUERKÖRPER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE RECURAGE

Publication

EP 0944345 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954896 A

Priority

  • DE 19649540 A
  • EP 9703633 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19649540A1] A scouring element comprising a gripping section (1) and a cleaning section (2), wherein the cleaning section (2) comprises metallic, edged, coiled cleaning materials (3), the gripping section (1) consists at least partially of foamed material (4), and the coiled cleaning material (3) is connected to the foamed material of the gripping section (1) on the reverse side of the cleaning surface and a partial side section (4a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/022 (2006.01); A47L 13/07 (2006.01); A47L 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 17/08 (2013.01); A47L 13/022 (2013.01); A47L 13/07 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649540 A1 19980604; DE 19649540 C2 19990121; AT 200206 T 20010415; EP 0944345 A1 19990929; EP 0944345 B1 20010404; ES 2157095 T3 20010801; PT 944345 E 20010928; WO 9823201 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110710

2013-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130604

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703315

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100816

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050709

2006-03-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060109

2005-07-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2005-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2004-07-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157095 T3

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703315 20010510

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB PT SE

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200206 T 20010415

2001-04-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIGNORET, CARLOS RENE

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980925

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB PT SE