Global Patent Index - EP 0944696 B1

EP 0944696 B1 2001-04-04 - HIGH PERFORMANCE METHOD AND PLANT FOR REGENERATING LUBRICATING WASTE OIL

Title (en)

HIGH PERFORMANCE METHOD AND PLANT FOR REGENERATING LUBRICATING WASTE OIL

Title (de)

HOCHLEISTUNGSVERFAHREN UND -ANLAGE ZUR REGENERIERUNG VON ALTSCHMIERÖL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE REGENERATION D'HUILES LUBRIFIANTES A HAUTES PERFORMANCES

Publication

EP 0944696 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97950242 A

Priority

  • FR 9702224 W
  • FR 9615380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2757175A1] The invention concerns a method and a plant for regenerating lubricating waste oil with low content of fuel, fatty acids and chloric products. The lubricating waste oil is subjected to the following steps successively: adding strong bases in aqueous solution at the rate of 0.5 to 3 % of pure bases by mass of waste oil; dehydrating and extracting the light hydrocarbons, extracting and recuperating the gas oil (stripping); extracting the impurities. The invention is characterised in that a complementary addition of a strong base in aqueous solution at the rate of 0.1 to 1 % by mass of waste oil is carried out following the dehydrating and extracting of light hydrocarbons. The treated lubricating waste oil are rid of their impurities by distillation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 175/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/02 (2006.01); C10M 175/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/00 (2013.01); C10M 175/0016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2757175 A1 19980619; FR 2757175 B1 19990305; AR 010353 A1 20000607; AT 200302 T 20010415; AU 5326998 A 19980703; BG 103577 A 20000531; BG 64486 B1 20050430; CA 2274831 A1 19980618; CA 2274831 C 20050712; CZ 300297 B6 20090415; CZ 9902118 A3 20000315; DE 69704500 D1 20010510; DE 69704500 T2 20020328; DK 0944696 T3 20010514; DZ 2369 A1 20021228; EP 0944696 A1 19990929; EP 0944696 B1 20010404; ES 2156008 T3 20010601; GR 3036074 T3 20010928; HK 1022928 A1 20010831; HU 0001433 A2 20000828; HU 0001433 A3 20010228; HU 222544 B1 20030828; MA 24424 A1 19980701; OA 11060 A 20030307; PL 186318 B1 20031231; PL 334068 A1 20000131; PT 944696 E 20010928; RU 2187544 C2 20020820; TN SN97189 A1 20000901; WO 9826031 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161006

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161006

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101205

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101206

2011-09-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091205

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091205

2010-07-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156008 T3

2001-05-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704500 20010510

2001-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990713

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200302 T 20010415

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990921

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990713