Global patent index - EP 0944700 B1

EP 0944700 B1 2001-01-17 - DETERGENTS FOR UNIVERSAL AND SPECIAL CLEANING OPERATIONS

Title (en)

DETERGENTS FOR UNIVERSAL AND SPECIAL CLEANING OPERATIONS

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSPRODUKTE FÜR UNIVERSELLE UND SPEZIELLE REINIGUNGSAUFGABEN

Title (fr)

DETERGENTS DESTINES A DES OPERATIONS UNIVERSELLES ET SPECIFIQUES DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0944700 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951784 A

Priority

  • DE 9702714 W
  • RO 9602184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9822563A2] The invention relates to detergents for universal and special operations, consisting of three basic modules, one anion module which contains up to 5-15 wt.% alkyl (C12) benzene sulphonate dissolved in water, one non-ionic module which has up to 10-20 wt.% fatty alcohol ethoxylate, up to 5-10 wt.% fatty alcohol alkoxylate, 0-0.2 wt.% complexing agent dissolved in demineralised water, and a solubilizer module of 45-100 wt.% dipropylene glycol and 0-55 wt.% diethanolamine or triethanolamine. The proportion of these basic modules amounts to at least 96 % of the concentrates used and/or the active substances contained in the cleaning solution, and is completed to 100 % by the addition of small amounts of specific active substances, such as anti-corrosives and/or fragrance. Due to the modular structure of the products, many possibilities exist for their universal use in households and in trade, as well as for the specific applications of surface cleaning of metals and plastics, and in the cleaning of jewellery and gems. The products contain a small number of substances, are easy to produce, and, because of the selection of materials, correspond to the best possible criteria for environmental compatibility and biodegradability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/30; C11D 3/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/2068 (2013.01); C11D 3/30 (2013.01); C11D 3/43 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9822563 A2 19980528; WO 9822563 A3 19980723; AT 198761 T 20010215; DE 59702938 D1 20010222; EP 0944700 A2 19990929; EP 0944700 B1 20010117; RO 112759 B1 19971230

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061120

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061120

2007-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060731

2005-12-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2004-05-21 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 01/24 PAGES: 266 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-06-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-06-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702938

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2001-01-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198761

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000208

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL