Global patent index - EP 0944702 B1

EP 0944702 B1 2001-01-17 - GLASS CLEANING PRODUCTS

Title (en)

GLASS CLEANING PRODUCTS

Title (de)

GLASREINIGUNGSPRODUKTE

Title (fr)

PRODUITS DE NETTOYAGE DU VERRE

Publication

EP 0944702 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97949957 A

Priority

  • DE 9702713 W
  • RO 9602183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9822564A1] The invention relates to products for cleaning glass consisting of 10-25 percent by weight alcohol, preferably min. 85 % ethanol or min. 90 % isopropanol, 0.1-0.5 percent by weight anionic tenside, preferably alkyl (C12) benzene sulphonate, secondary alkane sulphonate, fatty alcohol ether sulphate or fatty alcohol sulphate, non-ionic tensides, complexing agents, preferably 0,001-0.01 percent by weight ethylenediaminetetraacetic acid or 0.001-0.02 percent by weight of the trisodium salt of the beta - alanine acid, 0-0.4 percent by weight of a flavour or of a natural oil, 0-0.3 percent by weight of an antistatic agent, to be chosen from organic phosphoric acid partial ester and a quartenary ammonium compound with four substituents, identical or different alkyl groups or three alkyl groups and one hydrogen substituent, completed to 100 percent by weight with demineralised water. The proportion of non-ionic tensides consists of the combination of 0.1-0.3 percent by weight (with reference to the whole product) fatty alcohol (C10-C18) alkoxylate and 0.2-0.6 percent by weight (with reference to the whole product) fatty alcohol ethoxylate, as well as an antistatic agent based on a phosphoric acid partial ester. The products for cleaning windows contain 0-0.2 percent by weight of a phosphoric acid partial ester or 0-0.3 percent by weight of a quartenary ammonium compound as an antistatic. The products for antistatic cleaning and for cleaning coated and non-coated glasses lenses contain 0.005-0.02 percent by weight of a phosphoric acid partial ester or 0.001-0.03 percent by weight of a quartenary ammonium compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/20; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/33; C11D 3/36; C11D 3/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/34 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/201 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 11/0035 (2013.01); C11D 1/14 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/345 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9822564 A1 19980528; AT 198762 T 20010215; DE 59702939 D1 20010222; EP 0944702 A1 19990929; EP 0944702 B1 20010117; RO 112762 B1 19971230

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2007-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051120

2005-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051120

2004-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041120

2004-05-21 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 01/24 PAGES: 266 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-06-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-06-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2001-01-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198762

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000324

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990618

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL