Global Patent Index - EP 0944801 B1

EP 0944801 B1 2001-02-21 - STEAM GENERATOR

Title (en)

STEAM GENERATOR

Title (de)

DAMPFERZEUGER

Title (fr)

CHAUDIERE A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 0944801 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951103 A

Priority

  • DE 9702800 W
  • DE 19651678 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19651678A1] The invention relates to a steam generator (1) which is both suitable for a horizontal mode of construction and offers the advantages of a continuous steam generator. According to the invention, a steam generator (1) comprises at least one continuous heating surface (8, 10) arranged in a canal where hot gas circulates in a substantially horizontal direction. Said heating surface consists of a plurality of parallel and almost vertical pipes (13, 14) which are used to circulate a fluid, and is designed in such a way that the fluid circulating in a tube (13, 14) heated to a greater temperature than the following tube (13, 14) of the same continuous heating surface (8, 10) has a higher flow rate than the fluid circulating in said following tube (13, 14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 1/18; F22B 29/06; F22B 37/12; F22B 37/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/18 (2006.01); F22B 29/06 (2006.01); F22B 37/10 (2006.01); F22B 37/12 (2006.01); F22B 37/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/1815 (2013.01); F22B 29/06 (2013.01); F22B 37/12 (2013.01); F22B 37/74 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651678 A1 19980625; CA 2274656 A1 19980618; CA 2274656 C 20070213; CN 1126903 C 20031105; CN 1239540 A 19991222; DK 0944801 T3 20010611; EP 0944801 A1 19990929; EP 0944801 B1 20010221; ES 2154914 T3 20010416; JP 2001505645 A 20010424; KR 100591469 B1 20060620; KR 20000057541 A 20000925; US 6189491 B1 20010220; WO 9826213 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121202

2013-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120305

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-03-19 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-01-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD CHSP INTELLECTUAL PROPERT

- Effective date: 20011120

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154914

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703022

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-29

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000515

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB LI SE