Global Patent Index - EP 0944808 B1

EP 0944808 B1 2001-05-30 - COMPRESSED-GAS FIREARM

Title (en)

COMPRESSED-GAS FIREARM

Title (de)

DRUCKGASBETRIEBENE SCHUSSWAFFE

Title (fr)

ARME A FEU A GAZ COMPRIME

Publication

EP 0944808 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96944587 A

Priority

EP 9605680 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827398A1] The invention relates to a compressed-gas firearm (1), in particular a multiple-shot pistol, characterized by a novel valve system (39) for the pulsed release of compressed gas when firing a shot. The valve system (39) comprises two separately acting sealing devices, which are located opposite each other in the frontal end area of the valve chamber (19). The sealing devices both comprise one sealing ring each (22, 23), whose shape and position, in cooperation with the axially movable valve push rod (15), have a self-cleaning effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41B 11/06; F41B 11/32; F41B 11/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41B 11/72 (2013.01); F41B 11/721 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41B 11/721 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827398 A1 19980625; DE 59607021 D1 20010705; EP 0944808 A1 19990929; EP 0944808 B1 20010530; ES 2159776 T3 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59607021

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59607021

- Representative's name: PRUEFER & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59607021

- Representative's name: PRUEFER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101219

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101218

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159776 T3

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59607021 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990615

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT