Global Patent Index - EP 0944878 A4

EP 0944878 A4 2002-09-04 - TECHNIQUE FOR EFFECTIVELY GENERATING MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SYMBOLS REPRESENTING POSTAL INFORMATION

Title (en)

TECHNIQUE FOR EFFECTIVELY GENERATING MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SYMBOLS REPRESENTING POSTAL INFORMATION

Title (de)

TECHNIK ZUR EFFEKTIVEN ERZEUGUNG VON POSTINFORMATION REPRESENTIERENDEN MEHRDIMENSIONALE SYMBOLEN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE GENERER DE MANIERE EFFICACE DES SYMBOLES MULTIDIMENSIONNELS REPRESENTANT DES INFORMATIONS POSTALES

Publication

EP 0944878 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98949390 A

Priority

  • US 9819652 W
  • US 5948697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916023A2] In a mailing system for franking a postage indicium serving as a proof of postage, postal data including the postage needs to be communicated through such an indicium. Illustratively, the postal data is categorized into (a) invariable postal data, e.g., a device ID identifying the mailing system, which is unaffected by a franking transaction, and (b) variable postal data, e.g., the postage, which may change from one franking transaction to another. To avoid latency of the franking operation, the invariable postal data is preset for initial printing of the postage indicium, and the variable postal data is determined and set for printing in real time. In printing the postage indicium, the invariable postal data and the variable postal data are presented in that order in one or more symbols.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G06F 21/00 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0058 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00588 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00645 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00766 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5324923 A 19940628 - CYMBALSKI ROBERT S [US], et al
  • [A] US 5231668 A 19930727 - KRAVITZ DAVID W [US]
  • [A] EP 0757325 A2 19970205 - WELCH ALLYN INC [US]
  • [X] USPS: "Information Based Indicia Program (IBIP) Indicium Specification", INFORMATION BASED INDICIA PROGRAM (IBIP) INDICIUM SPECIFICATION, 13 June 1996 (1996-06-13), XP002137735
  • See also references of WO 9916023A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916023 A2 19990401; WO 9916023 A3 20020307; CA 2272595 A1 19990401; CA 2272595 C 20050621; DE 69840352 D1 20090122; EP 0944878 A1 19990929; EP 0944878 A4 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070117

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060906

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

2002-05-08 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2002-01-02 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990521

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE