Global Patent Index - EP 0944885 B1

EP 0944885 B1 2002-09-18 - LABEL FOR USE IN ACOUSTO-MAGNETIC ANTI-THEFT DEVICES

Title (en)

LABEL FOR USE IN ACOUSTO-MAGNETIC ANTI-THEFT DEVICES

Title (de)

ETIKETTEN IN AKUSTOMAGNETISCHEN DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNGSSYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

ETIQUETTE POUR SYSTEMES ANTIVOL ACOUSTO-MAGNETIQUES

Publication

EP 0944885 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952717 A

Priority

  • DE 9702893 W
  • DE 19651525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19651525A1] The present invention relates to a label submitted to a magneto-elastic excitation, for use in monitoring and identification systems. The inventive label is comprised of a semi-solid magnetic tape for desactivation and, preferably, an amorphous tape acting as a resonator. Said resonator is fixed by one side and the harmonic vibration is stimulated using a quarter of a frequency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24; H01F 1/153

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01); H01F 1/153 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2408 (2013.01); H01F 1/15316 (2013.01); Y10T 428/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651525 A1 19980618; DE 59708282 D1 20021024; EP 0944885 A1 19990929; EP 0944885 B1 20020918; JP 2001506025 A 20010508; US 6171694 B1 20010109; WO 9826390 A1 19980618

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-10-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051211

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051211

2005-01-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-21 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708282 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE