Global Patent Index - EP 0944934 B1

EP 0944934 B1 2000-06-07 - METHOD FOR CONNECTING LARGE-CAPACITY CABLE SCREENS TO ENSURE THEIR CONTINUITY OR THEIR EARTHING, AND EQUIPMENT USED FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONNECTING LARGE-CAPACITY CABLE SCREENS TO ENSURE THEIR CONTINUITY OR THEIR EARTHING, AND EQUIPMENT USED FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR DIE ERDUNGSKONTAKTIERUNG EINER FERNMELDEKABELABSCHIRMUNG UND VERWENDETE AUSRÜSTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RACCORDEMENT DES ECRANS DE CABLES DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MULTIPAIRES POUR ASSURER LEUR CONTINUITE OU LEUR MISE A LA TERRE, ET MATERIEL UTILISE POUR REALISER CETTE OPERATION

Publication

EP 0944934 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97919101 A

Priority

  • FR 9701626 W
  • FR 9611527 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2753571A1] The invention concerns a method for connecting large-capacity cable screens to ensure their continuity or their earthing, and equipment used for implementing same. The method consists in baring the conductive cable screen (9) using a rubber wheel, then contacting with said screen the base of a metal piece (1) on which are successively strung an adhesive joint, an insulating shell (7), a clamp fitting (11), the metal piece (1) being arranged for receiving a socket for electrical connection (12). The invention concerns the field of industrial equipment for on-site interventions on telecommunication network cables and particularly on pressure cables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/646 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2753571 A1 19980320; FR 2753571 B3 19981023; DE 69702269 D1 20000713; DE 69702269 T2 20010315; EP 0944934 A1 19990929; EP 0944934 B1 20000607; ES 2150767 T3 20001201; WO 9812774 A1 19980326

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030917

2004-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030916

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030916

2002-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150767 T3

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702269 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991119

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990316

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT