Global patent index - EP 0944936 B1

EP 0944936 B1 2000-11-02 - APPARATUS FOR MAKING CONTACT WITH A PART HAVING A BASE, IN PARTICULAR A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR MAKING CONTACT WITH A PART HAVING A BASE, IN PARTICULAR A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KONTAKTS MIT EINEM SOCKELTEIL,INSBESONDERE EINER GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ETABLIR UN CONTACT AVEC UNE PIECE POURVUE D'UNE BASE, NOTAMMENT UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE GAZEUSE

Publication

EP 0944936 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97913361 A

Priority

  • DE 19652309 A
  • IB 9701510 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19652309A1] A specification is given of an apparatus for making contact with a part having a base, in particular a gas discharge lamp, which is constructed in a particularly simple manner, the apparatus having a two part housing (1) which is made of a dielectric material, comprising a lower part (3) and an upper part (2), the upper part having an opening (9) for the introduction of the base, the apparatus having a centre contact (11) and having an external contact (10), at least one electrical interference suppression element (13, 13', 14) being arranged in the housing (1), mounts (17) for all the components (13, 13', 14, 10, 11) with which contact is to be made and for the connecting leads (6, 7) being provided in one of the housing parts, upper part (2) or lower part (3), and enabling positioning of these components in the housing part (3), the corresponding components being connected to one another by means of clamping connectors (26) and being fixed in the housing part (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/945

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 25/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/945 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/945 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01); F21V 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652309 A1 19980618; AU 5065398 A 19980715; EP 0944936 A1 19990929; EP 0944936 B1 20001102; WO 9827627 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051204

2005-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2005-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2004-11-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703453

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001124

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991227

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990602

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT