Global patent index - EP 0945044 B1

EP 0945044 B1 2000-06-07 - HEARING AID WITH IMPROVED PERCENTILE ESTIMATOR

Title (en)

HEARING AID WITH IMPROVED PERCENTILE ESTIMATOR

Title (de)

HÖRGERÄT MIT VERBESSERTEM PERZENTILGENERATOR

Title (fr)

PROTHESE AUDITIVE AVEC ESTIMATEUR AMELIORE DE PERCENTILES

Publication

EP 0945044 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96943123 A

Priority

  • CA 2257461 A
  • EP 9605623 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827787A1] The invention relates to a hearing aid, preferably a programmable hearing aid, having at least one microphone (1), at least one signal processor with at least one channel, an output amplifier (9) and an output transducer (10), at least one of the channels containing a signal processing circuit (4) with at least one percentile estimator (6) for the continuous determination or calculation of at least one percentile value of the input signal from a continuous analysis and evaluation of the frequency and/or amplitude distribution of the input signal, whereby the percentile value(s) serve either directly or indirectly as control signals for controlling the gain and/or the frequency response of the electronic processing circuit, the percentile estimator (6) consisting essentially of a comparator stage (12) with two inputs and two outputs, the first input being directly or indirectly connected to the input of the hearing aid, its two outputs controlling a first control stage (13) the output signals of which control a first integrator (14), the output of which, directly or indirectly, conveys a control signal to the signal processing circuit (5) and the second input of the comparator stage. The invention comprises at least a second control stage (16) connected to the first control stage (13), and at least one additional integrator (17) controlled by the second control stage (16), the output of which is connected to a further input of the second control stage (16) and to a multiplier stage (15) interconnected between the first control stage (13) and the first integrator (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06G 7/26 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/505 (2013.01); H04R 25/502 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827787 A1 19980625; AT 193797 T 20000615; AU 1195397 A 19980715; AU 725726 B2 20001019; CA 2257461 A1 19980625; CA 2257461 C 20010417; DE 69608822 D1 20000713; DE 69608822 T2 20001130; DK 0945044 T3 20001016; EP 0945044 A1 19990929; EP 0945044 B1 20000607; JP 2000511367 A 20000829; JP 3131226 B2 20010131

INPADOC legal status

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69608822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-07-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WIDEX A/S, DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69608822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BETTEN & RESCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-01-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BETTEN & RESCH, DE

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101210

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071214

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071214

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071214

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071214

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK GB IT LI NL

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193797

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991028

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK GB IT LI NL