Global patent index - EP 0945115 A3

EP 0945115 A3 2000-02-23 - Lifting apparatus

Title (en)

Lifting apparatus

Title (de)

Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de levage

Publication

EP 0945115 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98112409 A

Priority

GB 9806553 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945115A2] Apparatus for assisting a bather into and out of a bath, comprises a base (20); a telescopic lifting pillar with a second part (32) telescopically moveable upwardly and downwardly relative to a first part (31); a housing (22) secured to said second part; an actuator (61, 62) operable to cause upwards and downwards movement of said second part relative to said first part, said actuator including a drive motor (37) disposed within said housing (22) and further being arranged to apply lifting loads occurring in use to said housing; a support means (23) for a bather, carried by said housing; and means providing for translatory movement of said support means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1003 (2013.01); A61G 7/1019 (2013.01); A61G 7/1044 (2013.01); A61G 7/1059 (2013.01); A61G 7/1076 (2013.01); A61G 7/1092 (2013.01); A61G 2203/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945115 A2 19990929; EP 0945115 A3 20000223; GB 2335595 A 19990929; GB 2335595 B 20020821; GB 9806553 D0 19980527

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARJO HOSPITAL EQUIPMENT AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021105

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCDINE, ROY

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI