Global Patent Index - EP 0945274 A3

EP 0945274 A3 2000-02-23 - Thermal transfer printer

Title (en)

Thermal transfer printer

Title (de)

Wärmübertragungsdrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante à transfert thermique

Publication

EP 0945274 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301857 A

Priority

JP 7780898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945274A2] It is the object of the present invention to provide a thermal transfer printer which can realize a correct transfer even on the portion where the ink is overlaid on the already transferred ink or slightly transferred with the use of durable resin-based ink and a vivid multi-gradation recording. To achieve this object, the thermal transfer printer according to the present invention is provided with an ink ribbon (17) comprising a base substance (26), a separating layer (27) laminated on the base substance (26), and a resin-based ink layer (28) laminated on the separating layer (27), and a heat insulation layer (31) formed on a recording paper (29), and a control unit (25) for controlling a time of carrying a current to the thermal head (7) in a plurality of steps according to the gradation of an image to be recorded. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/36; B41J 2/325

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/325 (2006.01); B41J 2/36 (2006.01); B41J 31/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/41 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945274 A2 19990929; EP 0945274 A3 20000223; EP 0945274 B1 20051109; CN 1232751 A 19991027; CN 1234534 C 20060104; DE 69928155 D1 20051215; DE 69928155 T2 20060524; JP H11268313 A 19991005

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090310

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69928155

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030307

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 2/36 A, 7B 41J 2/325 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI