Global Patent Index - EP 0945332 A3

EP 0945332 A3 2000-09-27 - Scooter

Title (en)

Scooter

Title (de)

Roller

Title (fr)

Trotinette

Publication

EP 0945332 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99660049 A

Priority

FI U980151 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0945332A2] A kickboard, comprising a front frame member (2) provided with a front wheel (3) and a handlebar (1); a rear frame member (4) provided with a rear wheel (6); and a swivel joint (5) which links the front frame member (2) and the rear frame member (4) together. Elasticity of the swivel joint (5) provides a steering with a self-centering force. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62K 3/00; B62K 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/01 (2006.01); B62K 3/00 (2006.01); B62K 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62K 3/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0945332 A2 19990929; EP 0945332 A3 20000927; FI 3485 U1 19980723; FI U980151 U0 19980326; JP H11319184 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 62K 3/00 A, 7B 62K 21/00 B

1999-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI